CO HB1029 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Health Care Delivery Via Telemedicine Statewide

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Delivery Via Telemedicine Statewide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-20HouseGovernor Signed
2015-03-12HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-12HouseSent to the Governor
2015-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2015-03-04HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2015-03-02HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2015-02-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-27HouseSenate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
2015-02-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-26SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-02-25SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2015-02-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-02-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2015-01-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-01-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-01-22HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029hie_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AC2BDBA13720914B87257D90007666AD/$FILE/1029_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EA7AD8A43269B8EF87257DD5007AB8B7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4D0C6DD2B62AB5187257DD5007A6C7E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A071858D20BD92CE87257DD5007A768E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/87B5766474B3FE2287257DD5007A60DB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EA7AD8A43269B8EF87257DD5007AB8B7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4D0C6DD2B62AB5187257DD5007A6C7E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A071858D20BD92CE87257DD5007A768E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/87B5766474B3FE2287257DD5007A60DB
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E441FD367A54942B87257DF100789F2D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/CC7D04E5751BF13587257DF100788AFB

Bill Comments

feedback