CO HB1028 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the conditions for medical marijuana use for disabling medical conditions, and, in connection therewith, adding autism spectrum disorders to the list of disabling medical conditions for medical marijuana use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Condition Autism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Refer (2nd) (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1028 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-02-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-06HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Re-referred to House Committee of the Whole - No Amendments
2019-02-05HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-04HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-01HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-31HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1028
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1028_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c73e98ea1f72aad88725838b00714bb1-hb19-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c73e98ea1f72aad88725838b00714bb1-hb19-1028-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1028vote5a5a43
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1028vote5eb258
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f12dcaee15732541872583bd006f0484-hb19-1028-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1028vote54ffe3

Bill Comments

feedback