CO HB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorizing Colorado state patrol port of entry officers to direct traffic.
Title
Colorado State Patrol Port Of Entry Direct Traffic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1027 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1027 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1027 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2020-02-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |