CO HB1025 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of infrequently used tax expenditures, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Repeal Of Infrequently Used Tax Expenditures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1025, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |