CO HB1022 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning teaching civil government in public schools, including the history, culture, and contributions of American Indians, Hispanic Americans, African Americans, and Asian Americans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Teaching Competent History In Public Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1022 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1022 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1022 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 17-1022 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-30 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |