CO HB1022 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Assistance Authorization Period
Title
Child Care Assistance Authorization Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |