CO HB1022 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Mines Water Replacement Reqmnt
Title
Establish Mines Water Replacement Reqmnt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation tha it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation tha it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation tha it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1022 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-07 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2012-01-30 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-01-27 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-01-26 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-01-23 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |