CO HB1020 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Combine County Assessor Reports On Taxable Prop
Title
Combine County Assessor Reports On Taxable Prop
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-02-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-02-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2014-01-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-22 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |