CO HB1017 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of an interstate compact to allow a person authorized to practice psychology in a compact state in which the person is not licensed, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1017, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1017 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |