CO HB1016 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a voluntary contribution designation benefiting the Feeding Colorado fund that appears on the state individual income tax return forms, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Voluntary Contribution Check-off Feeding Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 22-1016 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water |