CO HB1016 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-13)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-13)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority to transfer jurisdiction of a veteran defendant's case to a jurisdiction with a veteran's speciality court.
Title
Transfer Jurisdiction To Veteran's Speciality Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Joint - CC_HB21-1016_2021A: Adopt the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 21-1016 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1016 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Joint - CC_HB21-1016_2021A: Adopt the first report of the first conference committee on House Bill 21-1016 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1016 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2021-05-19 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |