CO HB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning clarification of the scope of an existing sales tax exemption for manufactured homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scope Of Manufactured Home Sales Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1011 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Page 3, lines 2 and 7, strike "2.6" and substitute "26". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-11SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-05SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2019-01-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 01/23/2019 - No Amendments
2019-01-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-16HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1011
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1011_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f10ca5fd526fc613872583840070df4a-hb19-1011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f10ca5fd526fc613872583840070df4a-hb19-1011-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f10ca5fd526fc613872583840070df4a-hb19-1011-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1011vote5a4675
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/90b8f2072f76cc7e8725839800772908-hb19-1011-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1011vote598d7c

Bill Comments

feedback