CO HB1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the income tax credit for a qualifying contribution to promote child care in the state.
Title
Continue Child Care Contribution Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1004 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1004, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |