CA SR62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2323.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2323.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Royal Chicano Air Force 50th Anniversary.
Title
Relative to the Royal Chicano Air Force 50th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR62 Durazo (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2323.) |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |