CA SR57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2604.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2604.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Tijuana River.
Title
Relative to the Tijuana River.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR57 Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2604.) |
2019-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2320.) (August 29). |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Set for hearing August 29. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |