CA SR40 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2127.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2127.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to First Responder Day
Title
Relative to First Responder Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR40 Morrell et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2127.) |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | (Corrected July 14.) |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Morrell. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Morrell. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |