CA SR16 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 185.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 185.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to teen dating violence awareness and prevention.
Title
Relative to teen dating violence awareness and prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Sen. Shannon Grove [R] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR16 Rubio et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 185.) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |