CA SR114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 5042.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 5042.)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to immigration
Title
Relative to immigration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SR114 De León et al (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 5042.) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4921.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |