CA SJR3 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-15-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Social Security.
Title
Social Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Assembly - SJR 3 Wilk Senate Third Reading By O'Donnell (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR3 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR3 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |