CA SJR25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Batten Disease Awareness Weekend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Batten Disease Awareness Weekend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - SJR 25 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR25 Wilk et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-29SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2018-06-26SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-05-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-05-14SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback