CA SJR19 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military base closures.
Title
Military base closures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SJR 19 Strickland Senate Third Reading By GORELL (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SJR19 Strickland (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SJR19 Strickland (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6062.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-15 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |
2012-08-09 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3315.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-04-13 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |