CA SJR18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to small unmanned aircraft systems.
Title
Small unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR18 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - SJR 18 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR18 Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Assembly - SJR 18 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR18 Wolk (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4725.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2428.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected September 1). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2174.) (August 25). |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 25. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |