CA SJR12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to international exchange programs.
Title
Fulbright U.S. Student Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR12 Wiener et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - SJR 12 Wiener Senate Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Wiener (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Assembly - SJR 12 Wiener Senate Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Wiener (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6255.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2260.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |