CA SCR95 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-16)
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Title
Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Assembly - SCR 95 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR95 Bradford et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR95 Bradford et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-03-12 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2024-03-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4227.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 26). |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2984.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |