CA SCR63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-21)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-21)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day.
Title
Rose Ann Vuich Recognition Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Assembly - SCR 63 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR63 Hurtado et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR63 Hurtado et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-03-11 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:45 a.m. | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3736.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 24). |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |