CA SCR17 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-19-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to racial discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

International Day for the Elimination of Racial Discrimination.

Sponsors

Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Sen. John Laird [D]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]
Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Sen. Richard Roth [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Assembly - SCR 17 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR17 Leyva et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-30 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1157.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2021-04-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-03-22SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 567.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback