CA SCR115 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-23-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-23-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to drug abuse.
Title
Drug abuse awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SCR 115 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR115 Bates et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR115 Bates et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5956.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4656.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |