CA SCA20 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3210.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3210.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 11 and 12 of Article VI thereof, relating to death penalty appeals.
Title
Death penalty appeals: jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3210.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E. & C.A. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |