CA SCA15 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Sections 1 and 2 of Article XIII C thereof, and by amending Sections 2 and 3 of Article XIII D thereof, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government taxation, assessments, fees, and charges: voter approval.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateMay 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2018-01-03SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR.
2017-09-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after October 15.
2017-09-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback