CA SB995 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 117480 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Navigable waters: hazardous, medical, or human waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.Q. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 117480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |