CA SB983 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 149.7 of, and to add Section 149.2 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
High-occupancy toll lanes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB983 Hernandez (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB983 Hernandez (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3694.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3718.) (May 28). Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3308.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53084.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 149.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 149.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |