CA SB98 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 313.3, 2572, 8209, 8227.7, 8280, 8280.1, 14002, 14041, 14041.5, 14041.6, 17375, 17524, 35710.5, 38000, 41203.1, 41327.1, 41341, 41370, 42127, 42127.6, 42127.8, 42131, 42238.02, 42238.025, 42238.03, 42238.15, 44955.5, 46200.5, 46201.5, 47604.1, 47605, 47607, 47607.2, 47607.5, 47612.5, 47612.7, 47632, 47635, 47644, 48000, 51461, 52064, 52074, 52202, 54444.2, 54444.3, 56122, 56195.1, 56345, 56477, 56836.06, 56836.07, 56836.08, 56836.10, 56836.11, 56836.159, 56836.165, 56836.21, 56836.22, 56836.24, and 56836.31 of, to amend and renumber Sections 56836.145 and 56836.15 of, to amend and repeal Section 56213 of, to add Sections 8227.8, 14041.8, 41020.9, 41204.2, 42238.021, 44225.4, 44235.4, 44266.5, 45227, 47653, 47654, 47655, and 56214 to, to add Article 2.2 (commencing with Section 56836.14) to Chapter 7.2 of Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add and repeal Sections 17463.7 and 42603.1 of, to add and repeal Part 24.5 (commencing with Section 43500) to Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 56836.045 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.6 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 97.2 and 97.3 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to add Chapter 5.4 (commencing with Section 13265) to Part 3 of Division 9 of, and to add Part 1.7 (commencing with Section 10200) to Division 9 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Items 6100-158-0001, 6100-194-0001, and 6100-196-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, and to amend Sections 1, 4, and 9 of Chapter 3 of the Statutes of 2020, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: education omnibus budget trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB98 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Assembly - SB 98 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB98 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
2020-06-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-06-29SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-06-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-06-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-06-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2020-06-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-06-26AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2020-06-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2020-06-23AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 670.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code14002Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code14041Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code14041.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code14041.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code14041.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code17375Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17524Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code2572Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code313.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code35710.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code38000Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41020.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41203.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41204.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code41327.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41341Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code41370Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42127Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42127.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42127.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42131Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.021New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code42238.025Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.03Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code42238.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44225.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44235.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44266.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44955.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code45227New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code46200.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code46201.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47604.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47607Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47607.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47607.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47612.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47612.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47632Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47635Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47644Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47653New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47654New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47655New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code48000Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code51461Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52064Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52074Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52202Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code54444.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code54444.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56122Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56195.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56213Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code56214New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code56345Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56477Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.06Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.07Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.08Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.159Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.165Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code56836.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8209Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8227.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8227.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8280Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8280.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code17581.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code97.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code97.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13265New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback