CA SB973 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12930 of, and to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 12999) to Part 2.8 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employers: annual report: pay data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB973 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 973 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB973 Jackson et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 973 Jackson Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB973 Jackson et al (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 11. Page 5225.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3864.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3768.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12999 | New Code | See Bill Text |