CA SB967 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100720 of the Government Code, and to add Sections 18543 and 19548.9 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: tax returns: information sharing authorization and outreach.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 967 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB967 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB967 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5821.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3931.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3777.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3273.) (March 30). |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and GOV. & F. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18543 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19548.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |