CA SB959 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2715 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to water corporations.
Title
Water corporation: advice letters.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB959 Beall Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - SB 959 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Beall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Assembly - SB 959 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB959 Beall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4542.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2715 | New Code | See Bill Text |