CA SB955 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 3 (commencing with Section 6600) to Division 3 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Oroville Dam: Citizens Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB955 Nielsen et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 955 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By GALLAGHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB955 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 955 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By GALLAGHER (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB955 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 509, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6153.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6774.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4300.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | April 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 6600 | New Code | See Bill Text |