CA SB944 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 100520.5 and 100800 of the Government Code, relating to the California Health Benefit Exchange.
Title
California Health Benefit Exchange: affordability assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 944 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB944 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 944 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood Amendment Set #1 (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB944 Pan (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB944 Pan et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 944 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood Amendment Set #1 (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB944 Pan (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-13 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 5393.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 59. Noes 14. Page 6024.) |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3836.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3776.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3203.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100520.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |