CA SB933 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1748.30 of, and to add Section 1748.33 to, the Civil Code, relating to debit cards.
Title
Debit cards: service fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Jenny Oropeza [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 933 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 933 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By MA Amend By ADAMS Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 933 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By MA Amend By TRAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB933 Oropeza (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 933 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By MA Amend By ADAMS Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 42 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 933 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By MA Amend By TRAN Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB933 Oropeza (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Amendments by Assembly Member Tran tabled on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 6170.) Amendments by Assembly Member Adams tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon . (Ayes 42. Noes 34. Page 6171.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 0. Page 6185.) To Senate. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 9. Page 3786.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3403.) | |
2010-04-14 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2010-03-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-18 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-03 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |