CA SB92 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12975.9 to the Insurance Code, relating to property insurance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Property insurance: Seismic Safety Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB92 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 1983.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 897.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12975.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |