CA SB905 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 25631 of, and to add and repeal Section 25634 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: hours of sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 4366.) (March 13).
2018-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-01-18SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 17.
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code25631New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback