CA SB902 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65913.3 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing development: density.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB902 Wiener et al (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB902 Wiener et al (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 3797.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65913.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |