CA SB90 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 6377.1, 17053.73, 17059.2, 23626, and 23689 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, as added by Assembly Bill 93 of the 2013-14 Regular Session, relating to economic development, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development: taxation: credits: exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-03 - Assembly - SB 90 B.& F. R. Third Reading Urgency By SKINNER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB90 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB90 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-11SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2013.
2013-07-11SenateApproved by the Governor.
2013-07-03SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1649.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 1662.) Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred
2013-07-03AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. (Page 2276.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2277.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-07-02AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2013-07-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2013-06-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2188.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2013-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_90&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130626_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130701_amended_asm_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130701_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130702_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130703_enrolled.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130703_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_bill_20130711_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_vote_20130513_0150PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_vote_20130627_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_vote_20130703_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_vote_20130703_0219PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_90_vote_20130703_0937AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback