CA SB898 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - June 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1802.1 of, and to add Sections 1820.5 and 1824 to, the Insurance Code, relating to bail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail: surety insurers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB898 Hertzberg et al (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-20AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15.
2018-01-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code1802.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1820.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code1824Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback