CA SB893 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 2.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 2.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3212.13, 3212.14, and 3212.145 to the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: hospital employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-14-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 2.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3212.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3212.145 | New Code | See Bill Text |