CA SB885 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10801 and 10807 of the Education Code, relating to public education accountability.
Title
Public education accountability: longitudinal education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB885 Simitian Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 885 Simitian Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB885 Simitian (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 885 Simitian Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB885 Simitian (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6194.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-21 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen. | |
2012-01-09 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen. | |
2011-09-01 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-31 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |
2011-08-18 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ma. | |
2011-07-11 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-27 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-05-19 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 761.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-08 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-03-31 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 10801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 10807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |