CA SB868 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5515.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5515.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5515.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5515.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 113 to the Water Code, relating to water, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State water policy: groundwater resources.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB868 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5515.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5515.) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3134.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |