CA SB843 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 231 of the Code of Civil Procedure, to amend Sections 7522.57, 11555, 11556, 12838, 12838.4, 68502.5, and 68651 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 68085.1 and 70626 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 320.6, 2910, 2915, 5075, 5075.1, 5075.6, 5076.1, 6025.1, 6250.2, 6258.1, 6402, 11191, 13501, 13601, 23690, and 28300 of, to add Sections 2694.5, 5027, and 6404 to, to add Chapter 2.92 (commencing with Section 1001.85) to Title 6 of Part 2 of, and to repeal Section 5032 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 1716, 1719, 1720, 1723, 1725, 1766, 1767.3, and 7200.06 of, to amend the heading of Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 1716) of Chapter 1 of Division 2.5 of, and to add Sections 1718, 1721, 1722, 1724, 1728, and 5848.51 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business Su p 1SB843 Committee O n B. & F.R.(Leno) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 843 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB843 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 33, Statutes of 2016.
2016-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2016-06-21SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2016-06-16SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4382.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-06-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-06-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5388.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-06-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5358.)
2016-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-05-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2016-04-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-04-14SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3542.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-04-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-11SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2016-01-11SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2016-01-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
2016-01-07SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure231New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code11555Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11556Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12838Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12838.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68085.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code68502.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code68651Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code70626Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code7522.57Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11191Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13501Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code13601Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code23690Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2694.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code28300Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2910Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code2915Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code320.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5027New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code5032Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5075Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5075.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5075.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code5076.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6025.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6250.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6258.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6402Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code6404New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1716Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1718New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1719Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1720Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1721New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1722New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1723Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1724New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1725Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1728New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1766Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1767.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5848.51New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code7200.06Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_843&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160525_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160612_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160614_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160617_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_bill_20160627_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_vote_20160414_1031AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_vote_20160616_0940AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0801-0850/sb_843_vote_20160616_1142AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback