CA SB84 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1352 of, to add Section 2850.5 to, and to repeal Section 712.5 of, the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 927.9, 11549.3, and 51018 of, and to add Section 1304 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 44299.91 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 12211 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 4785, 5018.1, 5080.18, 5096.650, 14538, 14539, 14549.5, 14553, 14572, 14591, 25751, 26052, 26055, 26060, 26062, 26063, 35600, 35605, 35625, 42977, 48704, 71300, 71301, 71302, 71303, 71304, and 71305 of, to add Sections 25711.5 and 25711.7 to, and to repeal Sections 4124 and 4515 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 309.5, 2851, and 5900 of, and to add Sections 318, 740.5, 854.5, and 2120 to, the Public Utilities Code, to add Section 104.22 to the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 85200 of, and to add Section 10001.7 to, the Water Code, and to repeal Section 34 of Chapter 718 of the Statutes of 2010, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Act of 2013: public resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-03 - Assembly - SB 84 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB84 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB84 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 2292.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2149.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 895.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9). |