CA SB832 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6902.5 of, and to add Sections 17053.98 and 23698 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credits: motion pictures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4721.) (April 18). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23695 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23698 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6902.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |