CA SB824 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22971, 22973.2, 22978, 22979.24, and 22979.3 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 15570.40 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 71200 and 71215 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 408, 452, 6359, 6369.7, 6591.6, 6833, 7655.5, 8876.5, 9035, 12631.5, 30181, 30182, 30183, 30186, 30187, 30188, 30281.5, 30354.7, 30454, 32252.5, 32390, 38404, 38405, 38412, 38423, 38451, 38577, 38606, 38616, 40101.5, 40168, 41020, 41021, 41023, 41024, 41027, 41028, 41030, 41031, 41032, 41040, 41041, 41045, 41049, 41050, 41051, 41052, 41054, 41055, 41056, 41060, 41061, 41062, 41063, 41070, 41072, 41073, 41074, 41076, 41077, 41080, 41081, 41083, 41084, 41086, 41087, 41088, 41089, 41090, 41095, 41095.5, 41096, 41097, 41097.5, 41098, 41099, 41100, 41101, 41101.1, 41101.2, 41104, 41105, 41106, 41107, 41110, 41111, 41113, 41114, 41114.1, 41115, 41118, 41119, 41120, 41121, 41122, 41123.5, 41123.6, 41124.1, 41125, 41126, 41127.5, 41127.6, 41127.7, 41127.8, 41128, 41131, 41133, 41133.1, 41133.2, 41133.3, 41133.4, 41143, 41144, 41150, 41160, 41161, 41162, 41164, 41165, 41166, 41167, 41168, 41169, 41170, 41172.5, 41174, 41175, 41176, 43155.5, 43449, 43651, 44001, 44003, 44004, 44005, 44006, 44007, 45153.5, 45610, 46154.5, 46466, 50112.1, 50138.8, 55003, 55042.5, 55211, 55381, 60207.5, and 60495 of, to add Sections 38451.5 and 41053.1 to, to repeal Sections 6244.5, 41011, 41014, 41015, 41016, 41017, 41018, 41019, 41026, and 41163 of, and to repeal and add Sections 41010 and 41052.1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to tax and fee administration.
Title
California Department of Tax and Fee Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB824 GOV. & F (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 824 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB824 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - SB 824 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB824 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 432, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-03 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2440.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2021-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 897.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | From printer. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |